THOMAS ROBINSON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Thomas Robinson Charity makes grants in line with its aims and objectives supporting residents in Higher Bebington, Wirral. The Charity is small and is only able to support residents within this geographical area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Wirral
Governance
- 08 June 1964: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
June Bickford | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|||||
George Ian Murray | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.71k | £4.76k | £4.22k | £4.47k | £4.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.53k | £2.59k | £3.46k | £8.43k | £4.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE OF 25/11/1746 (SEE P.R.31 P.466)
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE DISTRIBUTED AMONGST THE POOR OF THE PARISH OF HIGHER BEBINGTON.
Area of benefit
TOWNSHIP OF HIGHER BEBINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 BLAKELEY BROW
WIRRAL
CH63 0PS
- Phone:
- 01513341956
- Email:
- C.VANINGEN@NTLWORLD.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window