ABBEYFIELD READING SOCIETY LTD

Charity Number: 233423
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Until 31.1.22, provided 24 hour residential care for 28 elderly residents. One this date all assets and activities were transferred to Abbeyfield Wey Valley Society.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Reading

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 March 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BRIAN THOMAS Trustee 28 March 2022
ABBEYFIELD WEY VALLEY SOCIETY LIMITED
Received: On time
THE ROTARY CLUB OF FARNHAM BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
AWVS HARDSHIP FOUNDATION CIO
Received: On time
Desmond Hutchinson Trustee 28 March 2022
ABBEYFIELD WEY VALLEY SOCIETY LIMITED
Received: On time
Andrew Peter Duffy Trustee 28 March 2022
AWVS HARDSHIP FOUNDATION CIO
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.19m £1.01m £1.28m £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.16m £1.27m £2.33m £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £69.26k £25.62k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £31.63k £180.35k £618.90k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £1.16m £824.19k £659.95k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £1.94k £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £175.00k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.15m £1.24m £2.31m N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £5.61k £21.98k £14.87k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £6.67k £7.08k £8.50k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 03 February 2024 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 March 2023 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 07 March 2023 35 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Maitland House Care Home
11 Maitland Road
READING
RG1 6NL
Phone:
0118 957 2826