Financial history THE CLERGY REST FUND

Charity number: 233436
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £47.55k £50.52k £23.52k £24.94k £35.37k
Total expenditure £68.89k £75.14k £50.71k £48.92k £51.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A