HENRY SMITH'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Distribution of vouchers to elderly and disabled in need to assist them in payment of fuel bills and grants to organisations who assist these client groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 23 July 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Bancroft | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Dennett | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|||||
DAVID PARR | Trustee | 18 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mark Nuti | Trustee | 28 May 2015 |
|
|||||
Kerry Reed- Brooke | Trustee | 16 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
DOREEN WEAVERS | Trustee | 28 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.00k | £21.00k | £21.00k | £23.10k | £23.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.01k | £24.71k | £24.68k | £24.56k | £22.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 16 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 20/1/1626-27 (P.R.4 P.449.)
Charitable objects
TO AND FOR THE RELIEF OF AGED OR INFIRM PEOPLE - MARRIED PERSONS HAVING MORE CHILDREN BORN IN LAWFUL WEDLOCK THAN THEIR LABOURS CAN MAINTAIN - POOR ORPHANS - AND SUCH POOR PEOPLE AS KEEP THEMSELVES AND THEIR FAMILIES TO LABOUR AND PUT FORTH THEIR CHILDREN APPRENTICES AT THE AGE OF 15.
Area of benefit
CHERTSEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Runnymede Borough Council
Runnymede Civic Centre
Station Road
Addlestone
KT15 2AH
- Phone:
- 07983558195
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window