PILTON VILLAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide and maintain a Village building for use by local groups, societies, individuals, public and private organisations to the benefit of all members of the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 30 April 1964: Standard registration
- PILTON PARISH HALL (Working name)
- PILTON VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- THE EDMUND CLERK PARISH ROOMS (Previous name)
- THE OLD PILTON WORKING MEN'S CLUB AND VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Terry Moulder | Chair | 27 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew David Richards | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alan Ayers | Trustee | 27 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
AUDREY BROWN | Trustee | 27 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA THOMS | Trustee | 27 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Mapstone | Trustee | 27 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Sumner | Trustee | 27 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Broxup | Trustee | 27 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.68k | £51.55k | £20.58k | £17.69k | £9.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.24k | £37.99k | £21.58k | £12.38k | £25.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £19.41k | £3.67k | £160 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 29 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 21 August 2024 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 01 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 17/09/2002 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 30/06/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22/04/2014
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION, SPORT AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF PILTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pilton Village Hall
St. Marys Lane
Pilton
SHEPTON MALLET
BA4 4BD
- Phone:
- 01749 890162
- Email:
- secretarypvhall@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window