Financial history BREDE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 233559
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £17.53k £22.63k £13.30k £16.70k £30.64k
Total expenditure £9.61k £12.88k £27.21k £16.25k £26.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £16.91k N/A N/A £5.88k