BREDE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of Brede Village Hall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income includes £5,877 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
- 08 September 1964: Standard registration
- THE INSTITUTE HALL, BREDE (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Duffield | Chair | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Mercer | Trustee | 21 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
XXXX Margaret Sandra | Trustee | 15 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline ARMSTRONG | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.53k | £22.63k | £13.30k | £16.70k | £30.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.61k | £12.88k | £27.21k | £16.25k | £26.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £16.91k | N/A | N/A | £5.88k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 9 AUGUST 1976
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARIS OF BREDE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS, OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE SAID OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FORTHE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BREDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brede Village Hall
Cackle Street
Brede
RYE
East Sussex
TN31 6DX
- Phone:
- 07541263991
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window