Financial history WARHAM VILLAGE TRUST

Charity number: 233576
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.60k £21.17k £17.49k £7.56k £11.53k
Total expenditure £11.79k £6.78k £10.79k £12.96k £21.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.71k £11.68k N/A N/A