JOHN HOOPER'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NONE WE HAVE JUST AN INVESTMENT WHICH IS DISTRIBUTED EACH YEAR
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 14 May 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KENNETH ARTHUR HAMES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
neville meeker | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER EARNEST REEVES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12 | £10 | £9 | £16 | £20 | |
|
Total expenditure | £11 | £10 | £9 | £16 | £19 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED AT P.P.R. ON 22ND APRIL 1895, SCHEME OF THE 1ST MAY 1974 AND SCHEME OF THE 4TH FEBRUARY 1986
Charitable objects
TO PAY 37%. THEREOF TO THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, KILMINGTON TO BE APPLIED BY THEM IN OR TOWARDS THE MAINTENANCE OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND BURIAL GROUND AT KILMINGTON AND TO APPLY THE REMAINING 63%. THEREOF FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF KILMINGTON WHO ARE IN THE CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS EITHER IN GIFTS IN KIND OR GRANTS OF MONEY WHICH MAY INCLUDE GRANTS TO ANY ALMSHOUSE OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTION ESTABLISHED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS QUALIFIED AS AFORESAID: PROVIDED THAT INCOME SHALL NOT BE APPLIED DIRECTLY IN RELIEF OF RATES, TAXES OR OTHER PUBLIC FUNDS BUT MAY BE APPLIED IN SUPPLEMENTING RELIEF OR ASSISTANCE PROVIDED OUT OF PUBLIC FUNDS.
Area of benefit
KILMINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCH ROAD FARM
CHURCH ROAD
KILMINGTON
WARMINSTER
BA12 6RE
- Phone:
- 01985844639
- Email:
- NJM639@MSN.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window