Trustees THE WILLIAM SCOTT ABBOTT TRUST
Charity number: 233603

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David William Ashley Burgess | Chair | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Leeds | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Fieldhouse | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gamze Bradshaw | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Barnhurst | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Edward Grange | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Pickering | Trustee | 30 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Mary Wild | Trustee | 22 December 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.