THE NATIONAL HONEY SHOW LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To encourage beekeeping through the medium of national and international competitive classes for honey and related products
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 May 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR R J MAURER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jeremy John Burbidge | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Carter | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Enid Brown | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Ruth Matheson | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MICHAEL DUFFIN | Trustee | 03 July 2017 |
|
|||||
MR C S MENCE MIMECHE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.49k | £45.19k | £80.60k | £99.69k | £112.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.78k | £40.15k | £90.37k | £96.53k | £116.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 08 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 08 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4TH JULY 1932 AS AMENDED 10TH APRIL 1934 AND 11TH SEPTEMBER 1934 as amended on 27 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
The objects of the Charity are to advance the science of apiculture and for the benefit of the public (a) to support and encourage good apicultural husbandry and management, (b) to promote an awareness of the importance of bees in the environment and (c) to promote and further the craft of apiculture.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Shire Lane
Chorleywood
RICKMANSWORTH
Hertfordshire
WD3 5NQ
- Phone:
- 01923 285637
- Email:
- gensec@honeyshow.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window