THE OXFORD BACH CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The practice of music of excellence of all times, with special regard to the works of J S Bach in order to foster public knowledge and appreciation of such music by public performance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bracknell Forest
- Buckinghamshire
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 19 June 1964: Standard registration
- 20 October 2023: Funds received from 272191 H L JENKYNS CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Andrew Timothy Frawley | Chair | 26 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Faull | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Marsh | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Jane Driver | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Patricia Fitter | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Isabel Shield Fenton | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anthony Blakeborough | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH JEAN STOCK | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.96k | £103.50k | £43.74k | £91.93k | £129.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.19k | £68.45k | £30.28k | £116.66k | £132.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 27 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 27 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION, REVISED 1962 AND REVISED AT AGM 1997 AND AMENDED ON 16 NOVEMBER 2009. as amended on 23 Apr 2018 as amended on 28 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE PRACTICE OF MUSIC OF EXCELLENCE OF ALL TIMES WITH SPECIAL REGARD TO THE WORKS OF J S BACH IN ORDER TO FOSTER THE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 The Butts
Standlake
WITNEY
Oxfordshire
OX29 7RS
- Phone:
- 01865 300215
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window