LASLETT'S (HINTON) CHARITY

Charity number: 233696
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Assisting in the repair, restoration, rebuilding and refitting of any churches and chapels connected with the Established Church of England; Assisting poor aged or infirm persons by making grants to organisations that help such persons, as the Trustees may think fit;

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 January 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anne Teresa King Trustee 01 April 2023
LASLETT'S ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
Nicola Jane Rogers Trustee 01 April 2021
LASLETT'S ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
Laura Catherine Nancy Baxter Trustee 01 January 2021
LASLETT'S ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
Lorraine Angela Preece Trustee 30 July 2019
LASLETT'S ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
Kay Vincent Trustee 31 October 2017
LASLETT'S ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
Douglas Brian Dale Trustee 27 January 2015
LASLETT'S ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
WORCESTER LODGE NO 280 BICENTENARY CHORAL FOUNDATION SCHOLARSHIP
Received: On time
COLIN ANSTEY Trustee 27 January 2015
LASLETT'S ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
Peter William Alan Hughes Trustee 29 July 2014
None on record
MRS G T NEWMAN Trustee 22 November 2012
LASLETT'S ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
MR J V PANTER Trustee
LASLETT'S ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
THE WORCESTER HERITAGE AND AMENITY TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
MR T J BRIDGES Trustee
LASLETT'S ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
THE WORCESTERSHIRE AND DUDLEY HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST
Received: On time
EARLS CROOME CHURCH AND TOWER PROJECT
Received: On time
ASSOCIATION OF FESTIVAL CHURCHES
Received: 127 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £419.31k £659.93k £724.64k £498.24k £581.92k
Total expenditure £380.85k £350.99k £473.69k £340.35k £409.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £412.36k £432.13k N/A £462.12k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A £15.49k £23.09k N/A £110.20k
Income - Other N/A £232.09k £269.42k N/A £9.60k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £349.62k £473.69k N/A £407.70k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £1.38k £0 N/A £1.82k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £1.60k £184.63k N/A £1.68k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £204.30k £289.06k N/A £249.88k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 N/A £1.82k
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets N/A £16.43m £17.64m N/A £19.29m
Long-term investments N/A £884.58k £974.25k N/A £1.95m
Other assets N/A £1.43m £2.54m N/A £1.86m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A £205.20k £362.85k N/A £363.96k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 17 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 22 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 22 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
KATERYN HEYWOOD HOUSE
BERKELEY COURT
THE FOREGATE
WORCESTER
WR1 3QG
Phone:
01905317117