Mineralogical Society of the United Kingdom and Ireland

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Mineralogical Society of the United Kingdom and Ireland, also known as the MinSoc, is an international society for all those working in the mineral sciences (mineralogy, crystallography, petrology and geochemistry). The Society aims to advance the knowledge of those sciences, and promotes them through scientific meetings and the publication of two scientific journals, both available online.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

28 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 March 1964: Standard registration
- 12 September 1996: Removed
- MIN SOC (Working name)
- MINERALOGICAL SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
28 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Samuel Shaw | Chair | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alfred Wilson-Spencer | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Pendlowski | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Savage | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Luke Townsend | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jonathan Lloyd | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Hailiang Dong | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Maggie White | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Mahesh Anand | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Annette Engel | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hannah Elms | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alessandra Costanzo | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ralf Gertisser | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eimear Deady | Trustee | 28 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christina Manning | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Laura Kelly | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Binoy Sarkar | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Hilary Downes | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Moreau | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Owen Weller | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Martin Smith | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tamsin Mather | Trustee | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Chun Hui Zhou | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Samantha Hammond | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Byrne | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stuart Mills | Trustee | 12 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Prof George Christidis | Trustee | 13 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
DR ROGER MITCHELL | Trustee | 07 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £326.42k | £250.74k | £253.07k | £325.41k | £299.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £303.86k | £231.72k | £269.38k | £310.14k | £338.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
BYE LAWS DATED 03/02/1876 AS AMENDED ON 08/11/1962 AS AMENDED ON 05/11/1964 AS AMENDED ON 17/12/1987 AS AMENDED ON 30/04/1991 AS AMENDED ON 06/01/1994 AS AMENDED ON 07/01/1997 AS AMENDED ON 07/01/2002 AS AMENDED ON 15/04/2003 AS AMENDED ON 07/06/2006 AS AMENDED ON 27/06/2007 AS AMENDED ON 11/03/2010 AS AMENDED ON 10/03/2011 AS AMENDED ON 06/03/2014 as amended on 15 Nov 2018 as amended on 14 Nov 2019 as amended on 12 Nov 2020 as amended on 11 Nov 2021 as amended on 10 Nov 2022 as amended on 09 Nov 2023 as amended on 07 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
To advance the education of the public in general (and particularly amongst scientists) on the subject of mineralogy and all related disciplines and to promote research for the public benefit in all aspects of that subject and to publish the useful results.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 11 March 1964 : Standard registration
- 12 September 1996 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Baylis Mews
TWICKENHAM
TW1 3HQ
- Phone:
- 02088916600
- Email:
- kevin@minersoc.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window