NEWNHAM WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ACTIVITIES OF AN EDUCATIONAL OR SOCIAL NATURE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 20 March 1964: Standard registration
- W I HUT (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Beagley | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Key | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Booty | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Smith | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE BAMBER | Trustee | 08 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA JEAN DAVEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE KAY SWAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.00k | £463 | £5.35k | £9.40k | £15.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.78k | £1.91k | £2.61k | £6.97k | £16.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 02 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES
Charitable objects
THE MAIN PURPOSES OF THE WOMEN’S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION ARE: (A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF WOMEN AND GIRLS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL AREAS INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION): (I) LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL ISSUES OF POLITICAL AND SOCIAL IMPORTANCE; (II) MUSIC, DRAMA AND OTHER CULTURAL SUBJECTS; AND (III) ALL BRANCHES OF AGRICULTURE, CRAFTS, HOME ECONOMICS, SCIENCE, HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELFARE; (B) TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (I) EDUCATING PEOPLE IN THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES; AND (II) PROMOTING SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION; (C) TO ADVANCE HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; AND (D) TO ADVANCE CITIZENSHIP FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION OF CIVIC RESPONSIBILITY AND VOLUNTEERING.
Area of benefit
NEWNHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
WILLOWBANK
UNLAWATER LANE
NEWNHAM
GL14 1BJ
- Phone:
- 01594516566
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window