Financial history The Friends of Whitstable Healthcare

Charity number: 233828
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £29.71k £12.09k £17.29k £69.16k £29.34k
Total expenditure £17.94k £73.54k £82.19k £49.47k £264.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A