The Friends of Whitstable Healthcare

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Voluntary organisation which raises funds to provide additional services, amenities and equipment for the benefit and comfort of patients and staff. Services have been extended to support and care for patients in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
47 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 14 April 1964: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF THE WHITSTABLE HOSPITAL AND HEALTH CENTRE (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF THE WHITSTABLE HOSPITALS (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF WHITSTABLE HOSPITAL AND HEALTH CENTRE (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF WHITSTABLE HOSPITAL AND HEALTHCARE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Georgina Ruth Baker | Chair | 15 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Swan-Beney | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Buckman | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Nelson | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE CALLIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRENDA MARY TILLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LORNA MARGARET DOYLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARIAN ELAINE AHERN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.71k | £12.09k | £17.29k | £69.16k | £29.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.94k | £73.54k | £82.19k | £49.47k | £264.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES DATED APRIL 1954 AS AMENDED 13TH MAY 1992, 22ND MAY 1996 AND 29TH JUNE 2002 as amended on 10 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE HOSPITAL PATIENTS AND FORMER HOSPITAL PATIENTS AND OTHER INVALIDS IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM AND, GENERALLY, TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE WHITSTABLE MEDICAL ESTABLISHMENTS.
Area of benefit
WHITSTABLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Whitstable & Tankerton Hospital
174-176 Northwood Road
WHITSTABLE
Kent
CT5 2HN
- Phone:
- 01227594636
- Email:
- WHITTANKFRIENDS@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window