MEDICAL RESEARCH COUNCIL STAFF BENEVOLENT FUND ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity helps present and retired members of staff and their families who experience financial difficulties. Each case is assessed on its own merits.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 June 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr MARK ADRIAN PITMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Clare Soares | Trustee | 11 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
David John Poor | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Anne Marie Philp | Trustee | 17 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Michael Bennett | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Catherine Moody | Trustee | 15 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN WHYTOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN SAWKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR JIM CLERKIN FPMI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VANESSA ANN COX | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.67k | £25.09k | £24.85k | £25.97k | £31.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.73k | £43.58k | £19.17k | £21.95k | £12.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 23 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 July 2022 | 364 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 29 July 2022 | 364 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 7 FEBRUARY 1964 AS AMENDED ON 19 MAY 1970, 15 FEBRUARY 1971, 7 AUGUST 1973, 20 JULY 1976, 17 MARCH 1980, 25 MARCH 1988, 30 MARCH 1990, 30 MARCH 1994 AND 26 JUNE 2002
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF NECESSITOUS PERSONS WHO ARE MEMBERS, EMPLOYEES, FORMER MEMBERS OR DEPENDANTS OF MEMBERS OF THE COUNCIL'S STAFF AND THE GRANTING OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO OTHER SIMILAR ASSOCIATIONS FOR THE RELIEF OF NECESSITOUS PERSONS. FOR FULL DETAILS SEE RULES AS MOST RECENTLY AMENDED.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
MRC STAFF BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION
MEDICAL RESEARCH COUNCIL/UKRI
7th FLOOR
CAXTON HOUSE
TOTHILL STREET
LONDON
- Phone:
- 02073952289
- Email:
- MRCSBFA@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
sbfa.mrc.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window