EYRE CHAPEL FOR ROMAN CATHOLIC PURPOSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Eyre Chapel is a remarkable monument set in the tranquil surroundings of Perrymead Cemetary on the hillside to the south of Bath. Built in the mid-nineteenth century for Count John Eyre, with architect Charles Hansom, it is a classic example of Gothic Revival Architecture rich and intricate in design. The chapel is open to the public by appointment and on advertised open days.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 12 March 1965: Standard registration
- EYRE CHAPEL TRUST FOR ROMAN CATHOLIC PURPOSES (Previous name)
- EYRE MORTUARY CHAPEL FOR ROMAN CATHOLIC PURPOSES (Previous name)
- TRUST FOR ROMAN CATHOLIC PURPOSES ADMINSTERED BY EYRE TRUSTEE COMPANY LIMITED (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
B J CARRUTHERS | Trustee | 01 August 1986 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.51k | £4 | £970 | £1.68k | £1.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.95k | £1.62k | £1.84k | £2.02k | £2.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 18 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20/11/1935 AS AMENDED ON 15/10/2005 AS AMENDED ON 27/03/2006 AS AMENDED ON 03/05/2012
Charitable objects
TO BE USED AS A PUBLIC CHAPEL FOR THE CELEBRATION OF DIVINE WORSHIP AND FOR THE PROVISION OF A BURIAL GROUND OR CEMETERY.
Area of benefit
LUNCOMBE AND WIDCOMBE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Walton Cardiff Manor
Walton Cardiff
TEWKESBURY
GL20 7BL
- Phone:
- 01684292600
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window