THE BRYCE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 233864
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of village hall facilities for the community to use for sports, recreational, educational, health and meetings. Current activities include Karate, Judo, Kendal Model Railway Club, Judo, Theatrical shows and Woodturning Club. The Hall offers space for business meetings and private parties, and is licenced and can provide a bar. Wi-Fi enabled and an induction loop in the Main Hall.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £38,455
Total expenditure: £45,620

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 May 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Yvonne Nelson Chair 23 July 2019
None on record
Nigel Crook Trustee 23 July 2019
None on record
Judith Notley Trustee 23 July 2019
None on record
Ronald Milnes Trustee 23 July 2019
None on record
Sue Cook Trustee 26 June 2014
None on record
IAN BURDETT CONWAY Trustee
None on record
GORDON JOHN LAWSON Trustee
None on record
SHEILA ELIZABETH DAWS Trustee
None on record
PATRICIA TURTON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £34.32k £9.21k £24.72k £32.81k £38.46k
Total expenditure £34.28k £30.09k £41.43k £30.35k £45.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.20k N/A £2.00k £2.50k £2.50k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 08 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 08 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 18 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Bryce Institute
Burneside
KENDAL
LA9 6QX
Phone:
01539 727142