Accounts and annual returns COELBREN MINERS WELFARE AND MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 233870
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2007 05 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 10 September 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 16 August 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 16 August 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 15 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 15 August 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2004 06 September 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 06 September 2005 On Time