ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS STORT VALLEY BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide basic veterinary treatment for State Pensioners and People on Universal Credit at a clinic run by part time staff and volunteers plus vets who are paid. Assist with costs towards neutering outside of the scope of the clinic. Provide advice and guidance on animals welfare. Work with national RSPCA in rehoming of unwanted pets Run a charity shop with part time employees plus volunteer
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
- Haringey
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 29 April 1965: Standard registration
- RSPCA STORT VALLEY BRANCH (Working name)
- RSPCA HARLOW BRANCH (Previous name)
- RSPCA STORT VALLEY BRANCH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dawn Hazel Cleaver | Chair | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Aderemi Adeleke Omowon Dr | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sam Wade | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diane Welsh | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matt Barber | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Mark Craker | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Charles Robert Thompson | Trustee | 16 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £151.37k | £193.95k | £228.68k | £205.28k | £231.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £152.70k | £152.70k | £200.57k | £259.03k | £248.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.95k | £17.19k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 November 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 November 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2020
(These accounts |
22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RSPCA BRANCH RULES EFFECTIVE 18 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE BRANCH ARE TO PROMOTE THE WORK AND OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY [ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS (219099)], WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE AREA OF THE BRANCH, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE POLICIES OF THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
HARLOW AND DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
R S P C A
23 The Stow
Harlow
CM20 3AN
- Phone:
- 01279306058
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window