THE FISHLAKE UNITED CHARITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief in need of either generally or individually persons resident in the Parish of Fishlake ,Doncasterwho are in conditions of need, hardship or distress by making grants of money or providing or paying for items, services or facilities calculated to reduce the need, hardship or distress of such persons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Doncaster
Governance
- 24 August 1976: Standard registration
- FISHLAKE CHARITY (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carole Smith | Chair | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Jackson | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
REVD EVELYNE SARA ATHERFOLD | Trustee | 10 November 2003 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA GRAFTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLAIRE ALICE HOLLING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.11k | £2.11k | £3.04k | £2.07k | £2.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100 | £100 | £4.69k | £2.67k | £5.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 12 April 2024 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 22 March 2021 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 24 AUGUST 1976.
Charitable objects
1) PAYMENT OF A YEARLY SUM FOR THE VICAR FOR PREACHING A SERMON ON THE FIRST SUNDAY IN DECEMBER TO ENCOURAGE PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF FISHLAKE TO BE CHARITABLE. 2) TO RELIEVE PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF FISHLAKE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF FISHLAKE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Barn
Sorrell Lane
Fishlake
DONCASTER
South Yorkshire
DN7 5LG
- Phone:
- 01302842768
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window