CHARITY FOR ROMAN CATHOLIC PURPOSES IN THE DIOCESE OF HEXHAM AND NEWCASTLE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Furtherance of the Roman Catholic faith
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Darlington
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Hartlepool
- Northumberland
Governance
- 30 June 1964: Standard registration
- 09 September 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF HEXHAM AND NEWCASTLE (Working name)
- CHARITY FOR ROMAN CATHOLIC PURPOSES IN THE DIOCESE OF HEXHAM AND NEWCASTLE TRUST DEED DATED 4/11/1867 (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 19 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 14 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 18 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 4 NOVEMBER 1867
Charitable objects
1. SITE FOR ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCHES OR CHAPELS FOR THE PERFORMANCE OF THE WORSHIP OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION 2. RESIDENCE FOR THE PRIEST OR PRIESTS SERVING THE CHURCHES OR CHAPELS 3. PROVISION OF SCHOOLS FOR POOR ROMAN CATHOLIC CHILDREN AND RESIDENCES OF PERSONS ENGAGED IN TEACHING SUCH CHILDREN 4. ANY OTHER PURPOSES FOR THE PROMOTION OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION OR FOR THE EDUCATION OF ROMAN CATHOLIC CHILDREN 5. CEMETERIES OR BURIAL PLACES FOR MEMBERS OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window