THE AMATEUR YACHT RESEARCH SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Primary activities: 1. Publishing journal 2. Holding meetings/conferences/discussion groups 3. Providing grants and sponsorship for activities in nautical research
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2020
People

16 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Belgium
- France
- Germany
- Guernsey
- Ireland
- Jersey
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Russia
- Scotland
- Switzerland
- Ukraine
- United States
Governance
- 02 June 1964: Standard registration
- A Y R S (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN PERRY BSC | Chair | 25 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Hillmann | Trustee | 24 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Leslie Gould | Trustee | 24 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Ryan | Trustee | 24 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
SIMON NICHOLAS FISHWICK CENG MIEE | Trustee | 24 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
H George Dimsdale | Trustee | 24 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jasper Graham-Jones | Trustee | 24 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Beigler | Trustee | 24 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Howard | Trustee | 24 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Nicholas Salvage | Trustee | 24 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kim James Fisher | Trustee | 10 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
TIM GLOVER | Trustee | 23 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CULP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT DOWNHILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR R MICHAEL ELLISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRAEME GIFFORD WETHERLEY WARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.90k | £4.41k | £4.49k | £4.39k | £4.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.79k | £6.09k | £5.05k | £3.40k | £4.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 280 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 280 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 646 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 646 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1011 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1011 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19TH DECEMBER 1963 as amended on 26 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND DEVELOP LEARNING AND KNOWLEDGE OF NAUTICAL SCIENCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BCM AYRS
LONDON
- Phone:
- 0123456789
- Email:
- office@ayrs.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window