Accounts and annual returns NORTHAMPTON ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESAN TRUST

Charity Number: 234091
Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 November 2024 303 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 November 2024 303 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 April 2023 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 03 April 2023 62 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window