THE GREAT YARMOUTH SEAMEN'S TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trustees firstly administer the charity's income to include the repair and insurance of The Fishermen's Rest Room NR30 3AH. The remaining income is administered by giving hardship grants to people who have work in fishing, other than for sport or pastime, worked in connection with the beach and sea in the Gt. Yarmouth area, excluding those persons employed in the amusement or scavenging areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Norfolk
Governance
- 21 May 1964: Standard registration
- GREAT YARMOUTH SEAMANS TRUST (Working name)
- THE GREAT YARMOUTH BEACHMENS AND FISHERMENS INSTITUTE AND BRITISH AND FOREIGN SAILORS HOME AND REFUGE FOR THE SHIPWRECKED (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD LUTKINS | Chair | 20 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Richard Clarke | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Barrett | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Fox | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
karen childs | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Patricia Davidson | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Patricia Ann Mays | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
susan lutkins | Trustee | 03 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Derek Little | Trustee | 14 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA Darby-Little | Trustee | 14 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.70k | £1.72k | £2.33k | £2.42k | £2.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.03k | £770 | £1.32k | £1.61k | £1.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF11TH MARCH 2004
Charitable objects
1) REST ROOM FOR THE USE OF NEEDY BEACHMEN WHO AR OCCUPATIONALLY EMPLOYED IN CONNEXION WITH THE BEACH AND SEA AT GREAT YARMOUTH. 2) LONGSHOREMEN WHO ARE OCCUPATIONALLY ENGAGED IN FISHING INSHORE, ALONG THE SHORE OR OFF THE SHORE AT GREAT YARMOUTH. 3) FISHERMEN WHO AR OCCUPATIONALLY ENGAGED IN FISHING AT SEA.
Area of benefit
GREAT YARMOUTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 KINGS DRIVE
BRADWELL
GREAT YARMOUTH
NORFOLK
NR31 8TE
- Phone:
- 01603742170
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window