Trustees THE GREAT YARMOUTH SEAMEN'S TRUST
Charity number: 234135

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD LUTKINS | Chair | 20 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Richard Clarke | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Barrett | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Fox | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
karen childs | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Patricia Davidson | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Patricia Ann Mays | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
susan lutkins | Trustee | 03 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Derek Little | Trustee | 14 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA Darby-Little | Trustee | 14 October 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.