Trustees RADLETT VILLAGE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 234147
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jeff Spencer Chair 19 November 2018
None on record
Tony Butwick Trustee 20 August 2024
None on record
ROSEMARI WHITEMAN Trustee 07 August 2023
None on record
LEWIS MYERS Trustee 21 November 2022
None on record
martin thomas Trustee 09 August 2021
None on record
martin delaney Trustee 09 August 2021
None on record
saleem khawaja Trustee 09 August 2021
None on record
IRENE SWAIN Trustee 19 November 2018
None on record
DIANE JEENS Trustee 16 June 2005
None on record