Register of Charities - The Charity Commission BRIDGEWATER FUND

Charity number: 292636-1
Removed charity
Governing document
WILL PROVED AT CANTERBURY ON 16 APRIL 1829 AND SCHEMES OF 14 JUNE 1907, 18 FEBRUARY 1936, 18 JULY 1960 (HIGH COURT OF JUSTICE), 26 MARCH 1976.SCHEME OF 19 MAY 1994
Charitable objects
THE PURCHASE OF MANUSCRIPTS FOR THE BRIDGEWATER COLLECTION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 23 July 1986: Standard registration
  • 16 October 2003: Removed (Exempt charity)
Other names

No other names