RUSSIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH ABROAD (LONDON)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The parish is a religious community. The objects of the Charity are the promotion of the religious life of the Parish and the promotion in England of the tenets of the Russian Orthodox Church and generally Orthodox Christianity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 June 1964: Standard registration
- RUSSIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH IN EXILE (ALTERNATIVELY LONDON RUSSIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicolas Henderson-Stewart | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev RT REVD PROF MATTHEW CRAIG STEENBERG | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vera McClenaghan | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lady Mary Leigh | Trustee | 14 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrei Henderson - Stewart | Trustee | 18 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
GREGORY WOLCOUGH | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANDREI TOLSTOY-MILOSLAVSKY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £273.51k | £250.30k | £307.83k | £315.92k | £466.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £279.82k | £248.78k | £276.69k | £324.09k | £397.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 January 2023 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 January 2023 | 79 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7 NOVEMBER 1954 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION OF THE TRUSTEES UNDER S74D OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 AS AMENDED DATED 6 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
PROMOTION IN ENGLAND OF THE TENETS OF THE RUSSIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH IN EXILE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 Gilstead Road
LONDON
SW6 2LG
- Phone:
- 02077316245
- Email:
- gregory@wolcough.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window