ALMSHOUSES OF ELIZABETH COUNTESS DE LA WARR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of unsupervised accommodation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
- Kent
Governance
- 09 June 1964: Standard registration
- THE ALMSHOUSES OF ELIZABETH COUNTESS DE LA WARR (Previous name)
- THE ALMSHOUSES OF ELIZABETH COUNTESS DE LA WARR OR THE ST JOHN'S ALMSHOUSES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COUNTESS DE LA WARR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Gillian Mary Halcrow | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||
MARK GRAHAM WEAVER | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev James CAMPBELL | Trustee | 09 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.56k | £22.04k | £24.12k | £24.16k | £27.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.87k | £17.20k | £15.22k | £15.82k | £28.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 23RD DECEMBER 1974 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 27TH FEBRUARY 1990 AND NOTICE UNDER SECTION 2
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ALMSPEOPLE OF THE SAID ALMSHOUSES OF ELIZABETH COUNTESS DE LA WARR, AND FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND REPAIR OF THE ALMSHOUSES. THE ALMSPEOPLE SHALL BE POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND WHO (EXCEPT IN SPECIAL CIRCUMSTANCES TO BE APPROVED BY THE COMMISSIONERS) ARE RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF WITHYHAM. PREFERENCE SHALL BE GIVEN TO ALMSPEOPLE WHO ARE QUALIFIED AS AFORESAID AND WHO ARE NOT LESS THAN 50 YEARS OF AGE.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF WITHYHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
HILLSIDE
LYE GREEN
CROWBOROUGH
TN6 1UU
- Phone:
- 01892661393
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window