THE EMBROIDERERS' GUILD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Embroiderers Guild is a national educational charity with around 1500 members and a network of just over 100 affiliated independent stitch groups. It has a museum with a unique global collection and offers a programme of exhibitions, events, workshops and lectures. It also has a specialist library and publishes Embroidery the successful textile art magazine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Isle Of Man
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 May 1964: Standard registration
- 20 August 2004: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE EMBROIDERERS' GUILD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Haigh | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Miller | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Smith | Trustee | 28 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alex Messenger | Trustee | 28 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Penny Hill | Trustee | 28 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANTHEA GODFREY | Trustee | 20 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £873.81k | £264.73k | £83.33k | £140.24k | £205.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £946.04k | £481.99k | £188.18k | £83.08k | £137.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £24.65k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £239.29k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £608.98k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £885 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £771.49k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £174.55k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £17.74k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 August 2021 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 09 August 2021 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 NOVEMBER 1934 AS AMENDED 15/01/1959, 18/06/1963, 10/07/1974, 18/05/1978, 18/05/1985, 05/051990, 09/04/1994, 22/031997, 27/03/1999, 15/4/2000, 05/04/2003, 03/04/2004, 02/04/2005 AND 29/03/2006 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20/06/2015
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE ART OF EMBROIDERY AND RELATED AND ENCOURAGE THE CREATION OF FINE ARTICLES INCORPORATING THE USE OF OR ASSOCIATED WITH EMBROIDERY; B) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND ART OF EMBROIDERY AND TO UNDERTAKE OR SUPPORT RESEARCH IN THAT SUBJECT AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH; AND C) TO COLLECT, DOCUMENT, PRESERVE, EXHIBIT AND INTERPRET EXAMPLES OF FINE EMBROIDERY WHICH ARE OF HISTORICAL OR EDUCATIONAL MERIT AND TO MAKE AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC SUCH ARTICLES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 08 May 1964 : Standard registration
- 20 August 2004 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bucks County Museum
Church Street
Aylesbury
Bucks
HP20 2QP
- Phone:
- 07455597039
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window