Accounts and annual returns THE SARAH ALICE TODD CHARITY

Charity Number: 234253
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 08 February 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 08 February 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 08 February 2017 27 January 2018 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 08 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 08 February 2016 07 February 2017 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 08 February 2016 Not Required
Annual return 08 February 2015 29 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 08 February 2015 Not Required