Financial history THE SARAH ALICE TODD CHARITY

Charity Number: 234253
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 08/02/2013 08/02/2014 08/02/2015 08/02/2016 08/02/2017
Total gross income £160 £81 £1 £1 £1
Total expenditure £0 £0 £1 £1 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A