ROBERT MONKS FOXTON CHARITY

Charity number: 234281
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Owns the freehold of the village hall and adjacent recreation ground in Foxton, Leicestershire. It maintains them for operational use. Provides loans and grants as permitted.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £43,208
Total expenditure: £48,272

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 May 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FOXTON VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
  • THE ROBERT MONK FOXTON VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NICOLA ANNE HAZELL Chair 28 March 2018
None on record
Joanne Asher Trustee 03 August 2023
None on record
Toni Dawn Rice Trustee 29 June 2022
None on record
Roger Peter Phillips Trustee 21 September 2021
None on record
Penelope Sharp Trustee 14 August 2019
None on record
Barbara Theresa Thelma Barrs Trustee 12 June 2019
None on record
KERRY FARNSWORTH Trustee 15 April 2013
None on record
VICTORIA EVELINE BRAY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £26.20k £36.70k £57.96k £53.08k £43.21k
Total expenditure £23.99k £28.31k £49.24k £36.98k £48.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £12.73k £9.39k £14.21k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 17 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

17 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 11 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 23 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 19 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF THE HIGH COURT OF JUSTICE (CHANCERY DIVISION) OF 16 DECEMBER 1927 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS OF THE 17 JULY 1928, 21 OCTOBER 1938, 6 MARCH 1953, 12 AUGUST 1960, 27 JUNE 1973, 21 MARCH 1977 AND 28 FEBRUARY 1991.
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE USED TO PROVIDE LOANS TO POOR AND DESERVING INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF FOXTON.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF FOXTON
Registration history
  • 22 May 1964 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
14 Paget Street
Kibworth Beauchamp
LEICESTER
LE8 0HW
Phone:
07909107558