THE CHURCH CHARITY OF JOHN ARUNDELL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide for upkeep and repair of parish church and burial grounds of the Ecclesiastical parish of St Dennis (St. Denys), Cornwall, and maintenance of services therein. Promote the religious and other charitable work of the Church of England in the parish of St. Dennis and to provide for matters incidental to these purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cornwall
Governance
- 03 June 1964: Standard registration
- THE CHURCH CHARITY OF JOHN ARUNDEL (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Christopher Charles McQuillen-Wright | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Graham Bradbury | Trustee | 03 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Lyn Griffin | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Kelvin Brian Yates | Trustee | 02 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Raymond Offord | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALAN JOHN MARTIN | Trustee | 26 October 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.05k | £74.85k | £57.18k | £61.03k | £64.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.96k | £101.10k | £50.28k | £51.72k | £24.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES OF 23 APRIL 1998.
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE APPLIED IN THE FOLLOWING WAYS (1) 25% TOWARDS THE TRUSTEES OF THE ST. DENNIS EDUCATIONAL TRUST; (2) THE REMAINING 75% TOWARD THE FOLLOWING IN ORDER OF PRIORITY: A) TOWARD THE UPKEEP AND REPAIR OF THE PARISH CHURCH AND BURIAL GROUND OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. DENNIS AND THE SERVICES THERE IN; B) THE PROMOTING THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE PARISH
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ST. DENNIS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rossland
St. Dennis
St. Austell
PL26 8BB
- Phone:
- 01726824813
- Email:
- jim.offord@codo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window