Financial history WORLD CONFEDERATION FOR PHYSICAL THERAPY

Charity Number: 234307
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.68m £1.11m £1.46m £1.22m £2.42m
Total expenditure £2.71m £1.33m £1.58m £1.75m £2.61m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £7.93k £7 £86 £11.16k £5.73k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.66m £1.10m £1.45m £1.20m £2.42m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £9.70k £10.60k £9.30k £7.16k £2.27k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.69m £1.31m £1.56m £1.74m £2.61m
Expenditure - Raising funds £20.79k £11.18k £13.38k £9.93k £684
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £43.12k £822 £82.22k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £4.08k £3.86k £684
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0