THE REGIONS BEYOND MISSIONARY UNION (INCORPORATED 1903)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
- Nepal
- Peru
Governance
- 05 July 1966: Standard registration
- 26 June 1998: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2004 | 30/09/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.86k | £3.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £926 | £87.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2005 | 30 May 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2005 | 30 May 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2004 | 27 July 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1903
Charitable objects
TO PROSECUTE AND EXTEND CHRISTIAN MISSIONS (BOTH HOME AND FOREIGN) BY VARIOUS AGENCIES, MEDICAL AND OTHERWISE AND ESPECIALLY BY MEANS OF MISSIONARY TRAINING COLLEGES, HOMES AND MISSION CENTRES WHEREIN CHRISTIAN YOUNG MEN AND WOMEN, OF ANY NATION OR EVANGELICAL DENOMINATION WHO PLAINLY MANIFEST THE REQUISITE GIFTS AND GRACE MAY BE (GRATUITOUSLY OR OTHERWISE) RECEIVED AND TESTED, AND INSTRUCTED IN BIBLICAL AND OTHER TRUTH, AND EXERCISED IN VARIOUS BRANCHES OF EVANGELISTIC AND OTHER LABOUR. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1903).
Area of benefit
WORLD WIDE
Linked charities
- 05 July 1966 : Standard registration
- 26 June 1998 : Removed
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window