Linked charities THE REGIONS BEYOND MISSIONARY UNION (INCORPORATED 1903)
Charity Number: 234349
Removed charity
Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 07/02/1956 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 16/10/1980 AND 23RD NOVEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
THE REPAIR, MAINTENANCE AND UPKEEP OF A HOSTEL OR HOME FOR THE RESIDENCE OF CHILDREN OF MISSIONARIES OF THE UNION AND THE RESIDENCE OF MISSIONARIES OF THE UNION ACCOMPANIED OR UNACCOMPANIED BY THEIR FAMILIES WHILST ON FURLOUGH.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Registration history
- 05 July 1966 : Standard registration
- 26 June 1998 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.