NEW GRAVEL PIT UNITARIAN CHAPEL FUND

Charity number: 234393
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Makes grants to religious bodies

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £9,294
Total expenditure: £1,130

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex
  • Kent
  • Surrey
  • West Sussex
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 September 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Ashley Hills Chair
None on record
David Mark Williams Trustee 17 April 2018
None on record
Rev James Corrigall Trustee 24 March 2015
None on record
JOHN EDWARD PARSONS Trustee 24 March 2015
GOLDERS GREEN UNITARIAN MANSE TRUST
Received: 184 days late
HOWARD HAGUE Trustee
UNITARIAN HISTORICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
Rev Feargus MacCabe O'Connor Trustee
THE INQUIRER PUBLISHING COMPANY (2004)
Received: 176 days late
ANNETTE PERCY Trustee
FUNDS HELD IN CONNECTION WITH THE DUNHAM ROAD UNITARIAN CHAPEL
Received: On time
THE DVORAK SOCIETY
Received: On time
LONDON DISTRICT & SE PROVINCIAL ASSEMBLY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.58k £7.63k £8.07k £9.01k £9.29k
Total expenditure £3.35k £6.63k £17.41k £6.92k £1.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CHARITY COMMISSION SCHEME SEALED 6TH JUNE 1990
Charitable objects
MAINTENANCE OF ANY SUNDAY SCHOOL CONNECTED WITH UNITARIAN CHURCH IN AREA AND PROMOTING EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS (DISTRIBUTION OF INCOME) ASSOCIATED WITH THESE CHURCHES.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF HACKNEY
Registration history
  • 21 September 1995 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
The Saddlery
Lychgate Lane
Aston Flamville
Hinckley
LE10 3AQ
Phone:
01455233232
Website:

No information available