LAVENHAM CHARITIES FOR THE POOR

Charity number: 234510
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

1. Provision of Almshouse accommodation in Lavenham. 2. Provision of Grants to the needy of the village.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £42,163
Total expenditure: £24,296

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 June 1964: Standard registration
  • 03 July 1995: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ISAAC CREME (Working name)
  • Lavenham Charities (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JEREMY ROBINSON Chair
THE LAVENHAM EXHIBITION ENDOWMENT
Received: On time
Rev Simon John Pitcher Trustee 05 April 2023
ROBERT RYCE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Yvonne Robinson Trustee 05 April 2023
None on record
John Heeks Trustee 04 December 2019
None on record
Philip Robson Trustee 19 February 2019
None on record
JANE TERESA GOSLING Trustee 03 August 2017
LAVENHAM EXHIBITION AND MUSEUM TRUST
Received: On time
THE LAVENHAM EXHIBITION ENDOWMENT
Received: On time
STEPHEN JOHN FAIERS Trustee 05 October 2016
None on record
MAUREEN ELIZABETH MARY WILDING Trustee 01 February 2016
None on record
Alan Fayers Trustee 20 March 2015
None on record
Doreen Twitchett Trustee 06 November 2013
None on record
TIM RHODES Trustee
None on record
ROBERT NORMAN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £39.55k £35.62k £36.13k £33.13k £42.16k
Total expenditure £21.64k £18.05k £27.30k £49.23k £24.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 12 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 17 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 24 APRIL 1963.
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR AND FOR ALMSPEOPLE OF THE ALMSHOUSES OF OLD TOWN LAND'S CHARITY WHO SHALL BE POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE PARISH AT THE TIME OF APPOINTMENT.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF LAVENHAM
Registration history
  • 03 June 1964 : Standard registration
  • 03 July 1995 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
18 Peek Close
Lavenham
SUDBURY
Suffolk
CO10 9FR
Phone:
07787524444
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available