THE UNITED SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In 2017, the Society supported programmes in more than 20 countries spread across 14 Anglican provinces through relationship and partnership. Our programmes equip church leaders with skills that enable wider participation in integral mission and development as well as empower churches and ordinary people to take control of their health and communities through vibrant and participatory processes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£3,680,000
Donations and legacies | £1.63m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.93m | |
Other | £121.00k |
Total expenditure:
£3,912,000
Raising funds | £517.00k | |
Charitable activities | £3.40m | |
Other | £0 |
£3,662,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £517.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.40m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £517.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.40m | |
Retained for future use | £3.43m |
People

22 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bangladesh
- Brazil
- Burma
- Egypt
- Ghana
- India
- Kenya
- Lesotho
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Namibia
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Pakistan
- Philippines
- Sierra Leone
- South Africa
- Sri Lanka
- Tanzania
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 27 November 1967: Standard registration
- 01 May 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- U S P G (Working name)
- US (Working name)
- THE UNITED SOCIETY FOR THE PROPAGATION OF THE GOSPEL (Previous name)
- UNITED SOCIETY KNOW AS US (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev David Stuart Walker | Chair | 06 December 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||
Samuel Patrick Sutherland Williams | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||
Rosemary Helen Dawson | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||
Christine Helen Dyer | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Prof Emma Lindsay Wild-Wood | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
John Peter Dimitri Wienand | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rev Joseph Patricius Hawes | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||
The Venerable Dr Chigor Chike | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||
MATHEN THOMAS | Trustee | 10 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Charles Cowling | Trustee | 10 September 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||
Catriona Sarah Duffy | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
CATHERINE JOANNA WICKENS | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.18m | £3.00m | £3.12m | £3.40m | £3.68m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.25m | £3.67m | £3.11m | £3.30m | £3.91m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.13k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.43m | £1.21m | £1.34m | £1.57m | £1.63m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.70m | £1.70m | £1.75m | £1.80m | £1.93m | |
|
Income - Other | £54.00k | £96.00k | £35.00k | £35.00k | £121.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £631.00k | £452.00k | £576.00k | £614.00k | £866.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.19m | £3.05m | £2.65m | £2.92m | £3.40m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £411.00k | £619.00k | £462.00k | £382.00k | £517.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £163.00k | £117.00k | £102.00k | £144.00k | £207.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £1.26m | £1.17m | £1.62m | £1.30m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £51.00k | £51.00k | £60.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £650.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £5.24m | £4.00m | £3.93m | £3.87m | £3.34m | |
|
Long-term investments | £50.91m | £53.85m | £61.58m | £54.58m | £58.31m | |
|
Other assets | £1.70m | £1.20m | £1.40m | £1.69m | £2.12m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£2.67m | -£4.79m | -£875.00k | -£37.00k | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.53m | £1.66m | £2.33m | £2.55m | £2.63m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTERS OF 16/06/1701, 6/04/1882, 22/08/1921, 21/06/1956, AND ORDER IN COUNCIL 30/10/1964. AS AMENDED ON 19/11/96 AND AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION MADE UNDER SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 ON 20TH MARCH 1998 AND 9TH JUNE 1998. ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 11/12/2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF THE ANGLICAN CHURCHES OF BRITAIN AND IRELAND AMONGST THE CHURCHES OF THE ANGLICAN COMMUNION AND THE COMMUNITIES THEY SERVE, THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, INCLUDING THROUGH, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (I) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY; (II) THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH; (III) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED MEMBERS OF SUCH COMMUNITIES IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; (IV) THE TRAINING, DEVELOPMENT AND OTHER SUPPORT OF CHURCH LEADERS; (V) THE PROVISION OF ADVOCACY AND WORKING COLLABORATIVELY WITH SUCH CHURCHES AND COMMUNITIES; AND (VI) ANY OTHER MEANS AIMED AT IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND PROSPECTS FOR THE FUTURE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DEEM FIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AS PRACTISED IN THE ANGLICAN COMMUNION; INCLUDING ACTING IN CO-OPERATION WITH PARTNERS IN ORDER TO ACHIEVE SUCH CHARITABLE OUTCOMES.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Linked charities
- A T WESTON BEQUEST
- ACKROYD'S GIFT
- ADA WARDEN BURSARY FUND
- AFRICAN ORDINANDS FUND (MASASI)
- AHMEDNAGAR MISSION FUND (NASIK)
- ALGOMA ASSOCIATION TRUST
- ALICE MARKHAM MEMORIAL FUND
- ALICE MARY MOOR FOR ST BARNABAS CHURCH MUKDEN, CHINA
- ALL SAINTS CHURCH ROME CHAPLAINCY TRUST
- AMERICAN COLONIAL BISHOPS FUND
- ANGLICAN COUNCIL OF MALAWI FUND
- ANNA MARIA HOBHOUSE CHARITY
- ANTIGUA CLERGY SUSTENTATION FUND
- ARCHBISHOP TENISON'S TRUST FUND
- ARCHDEACON EYRE
- BAHAMAS CLERGY SUSTENTATION FUND
- BAKER BURSARY
- BALFOUR TRUST
- BAMFORD COT
- BEQUEST FOR BENEFIT OF MISSIONARIES ON FURLOUGH
- BEQUEST FOR TRAINING OF MEN FOR THE MINISTRY
- BEQUEST OF THE REVEREND H L DIXON
- BINNEY TRUST
- BISHOP ALFRED WILLIS
- BISHOP BINNEY FUND
- BISHOP C MAPLES (LEBOMBO)
- BISHOP C MAPLES (MALAWI)
- BISHOP C P SCOTT TRUST
- BISHOP CROSSLEY'S BEQUEST
- BISHOP DOUGLAS MEMORIAL FUND
- BISHOP DOUGLAS MEMORIAL FUND
- BISHOP FISHER LEGACY (LEBOMBO)
- BISHOP FISHER LEGACY (MALAWI)
- BISHOP FISHER LEGACY (SOUTH WEST TANGANYIKA)
- BISHOP GWYER MEMORIAL FUND
- BISHOP JACOB SCHOLARSHIP
- BISHOP ROBERTS MEMORIAL FUND
- BISHOP ROBINS ASSISTANT BURSARY
- BISHOP STEERE MEMORIAL FUND
- BISHOP WESTON MEMORIAL FUND
- BISHOPRICS ENDOWMENT FUND
- BISHOPS FUND (NASSAU)
- BROUGH MEMORIAL FUND
- BUCHANAN MEDICAL ENDOWMENT FUND (OTHERWISE THE SCOTCH BED FUND)
- BUILDING RESERVE FUND (MALAWI)
- BULLOCK-WEBSTER MEMORIAL FUND
- C R E WILLOUGHBY-PIGGOTT TRUST FUND
- CALCUTTA BISHOPS COLLEGE ENDOWMENT FUND
- CALDER ANNUITY
- CAMBRIDGE MISSION TO DELHI
- CANDIDATES FUND
- CANON BINNEY PASSAGE FUND
- CANON E DICKSON
- CANON EDWARD RUSSELL MEMORIAL FUND
- CANON G J BOISSIER BEQUEST
- CANON J A HARDING TRUST
- CANON SAMUEL SCOTT ALNUTT
- CANON SAMUEL SCOTT ALNUTT
- CARACAS ANGLICAN CHURCH TRUST
- CARDEW-WHITEHOUSE TRUST
- CECILIA RUTH MORSE MEMORIAL BED
- CHARITY OF HELEN EDITH BROWELL
- CHARLES JOHN CORFE
- CHOTA NAGPUR BISHIPRIC
- CHURCH ENDOWMENT (NASSAU)
- CHURCH ENDOWMENT FUND SLIEMA MALTA
- COCHRANE TRUST
- COLEMAN TRUST
- COLONEL W A LEE TRUST
- COMMUNITY GIFT
- CONSOLIDATED BED FUND
- CONSTANCE BUNYON MEMORIAL
- CONSTANTINOPLE CHURCH REPAIR ENDOWMENT FUND
- CORBAN TRUST FUND
- COT ENDOWMENT FOR ST MARTINS HOSPITAL, RAMNAD INDIA
- CUBBON BURSARY FUND
- CURLING TRUST
- DAMARALAND TRUST
- DEACONESS KATHERINE BEYNON SCHOLARSHIPS
- DEACONESS S E M SMITH TRUST
- DEACONESS WILSON FUND
- DEBRITZEN COLLEGE FUND
- DIOCESAN RESERVE FUND (NASSAU)
- DORA BLYTH MEMORIAL
- DOUGLAS BEQUEST (LEBOMBO)
- DOUGLAS BEQUEST (MALAWI)
- DOUGLAS BEQUEST (SWT)
- DOWNES TRUST
- DR ETHEL PRYCE MEMORIAL
- DR JAMES AURIOL ARMITAGE BEQUEST
- E C WILSON TRUST
- E E FORREST
- E M C TRUST
- EAST BENGAL TRUST
- EDITH AMY WHITTUCK
- EDITH SHELLEY MEMORIAL FUND
- EDWIN GUEST
- ELEANOR YALE
- EMMA TEBBS
- ETHEL HILYARD BEQUEST
- F E WILLIAMS BEQUEST
- F E WILLIAMS BEQUEST FOR ST AIDANS MISSION
- F H AND M E BAILEY MEMORIAL
- FENN FUND (OTHERWISE THE VICTORIA SCHOOL AND ST PAUL'S HOSTEL FUND)
- FR JACKSON MEMORIAL TRUST
- FRANCISKA WEBER MORNEX CHAPEL FUND
- FRANK PRATT-BARLOW FOR ENGLISH CHURCH AT MONTE CARLO
- FRANKFURT CHAPLAINCY FUND
- FUND FOR CONSTANTINOPLE CHURCH
- FUND FOR INDIAN WORKER
- FUND FOR NORTH QUEENSLAND BUSH BROTHERHOOD
- FUND FOR ST ANDREW'S CHURCH PAU
- FUND FOR ST JOHN THE BAPTIST NATIVE SCHOOL, SUVA POLYNESIA
- FUND FOR THE WARDEN OF ST CHAD'S COLLEGE REGINA
- G H WEBER
- GENERAL RESERVE FUND
- GIFT OF CANON AND MRS G L TIDEY
- GUIANA CONSOLIDATION FUND
- GUILD OF ST KENTIGERN
- H J BUXTON'S BEQUEST
- HARDMAN TRUST
- HAWKES FOR MISSIONARY WORK
- HAWKINS SCHOLARSHIP
- HENRY HERBERT WILLS' LEGACY
- HERBERT MILLER
- HICKES TRUST
- HILDA CHRISTINE HAWORTH
- HILL TRUST
- HINTON PINCKNEY MEMORIAL
- HORNBY FUND (MALAWI)
- HOSPITAL FUND TRUST
- IN MEMORY OF T L AND A M B
- ISABEL PULTENEY BURSARY FUND
- JAPAN CHURCH AID
- JAVA MISSION TRUST
- JULIA TORRANCE BEQUEST
- KAPPALI TRUST FUND
- KINDERSLEY TRUST
- KING MEMORIAL
- KINGSBURY, ST ANDREW TRUST FUND
- KOBE FELLOWSHIP A FUND
- KOBE-BICKERS BEQUEST FUND
- L AND E MEMORIAL FUND
- LAKE MALAWI LAY TRAINING FUND
- LANGLANDS TRUST
- LINDLEY ENDOWMENT FUND
- LONDON DIOCESAN MISSIONARY STUDENTSHIP
- M M CHOTA MAGPUR ANON GES
- M MILLER STUDENTSHIP
- M W TARRANT BEQUEST
- MADAGASCAR BISHOPRIC ENDOWMENT FUND
- MALAWI - AFRICAN CLERGY AND TEACHERS PENSION FUND
- MARIAN LAMBERT BEQUEST
- MARRIOTT BEQUEST NO 1
- MARRIOTT BEQUEST NO 2
- MARSON ORDINATION FUND
- MARY BALL MEMORIAL
- MARY GERTRUDE BLAKESTON
- MARY MOSSE BED (ST MARTIN'S HOSPITAL RAMNAD)
- MASSON TRUST FOR CHAPLAIN
- MASSON TRUST FOR STUTTGART CHURCH REPAIR FUND
- MATILDA MILLER'S BEQUEST
- MATILDA MILLER'S BEQUEST FOR A FEMALE MISSIONARY
- MCCAWLEY FUND
- MEDICAL FUND
- MFM GIFT
- MICHAEL LLOYD FERRAR MEMORIAL FUND
- MISS A E EDWARDS ENDOWMENT FOR SOUTH INDIA CHURCH AID
- MISS A J WALKER'S BEQUEST (OR NASIK WALKER)
- MISS CONSTANCE MONICA BACON
- MISS CONSTANCE MONICA BACON
- MISS E M HARRISON GIFT
- MISS F H ANSON
- MISS G I ISAAC
- MISS H HAMILTON'S GIFT
- MISS M G TOOVEY'S BEQUEST
- MISS M H DAVIES GIFT
- MISS M H STOKES GIFT
- MISS MARY ELLEN RODD MARTIN BEQUEST
- MISS N E WINDLE'S GIFT
- MISS ROSE ADA SAVAGE MEMORIAL
- MISS SHANTI DEVI DITTA FOR WOMEN'S BURSARY FUND
- MISSIONARIES MEMORIAL FUND
- MKOMAINDO HOSPITAL RESERVE FUND (OR ARSCOTT BED FUND)
- MONCKTON FUND
- MOSSE MEMORIAL FUND
- MOWBRAY MEMORIAL FUND (LEBOMBO)
- MOWBRAY MEMORIAL FUND (MALAWI)
- MRS CROSSLEY'S BEQUEST
- MRS M A H MARSH
- MRS WAINWRIGHT TRUST FOR TONGA
- NASIK DIOCESAN CENTRAL FUND
- NEW DIOCESES FUND
- NEW DIOCESES FUND
- NEWTON BEQUEST
- NKHOTAKOTA COMMUNITY TRAINING CENTRE ENDOWMENT FUND
- NORTH CHINA AND SHANTUNG MISSIONARY ASSOCIATION
- NORTH CHINA DIOCESAN FUND
- NYASALAND RESERVE FUND
- OLIVIA WAY FOR HOMES OF REST
- OSWIN CREIGHTON PRIZE FUND
- PARTICULAR MAINTENANCE FUND
- PATTESON STUDENTSHIP
- PATTOKI TRUST
- PEARCE TRUST
- PMM TRUST
- RAILWAY MISSION OF RHODESIA AND BOTSWANA
- RESERVE FUND (LEBOMBO)
- RESERVE FUND (SWT)
- RETIRING ALLOWANCES FUND (SIR JAMES STEWART)
- REV A W BOOTLE BUILDING FUND
- REVEREND A J DOUGLAS MEMORIAL FUND
- REVEREND ALEXANDER CHARLES MAITLAND
- REVEREND C E B NEATE'S GIFT
- REVEREND C W MILLER'S BEQUEST
- REVEREND CHARLES FREDERICK CORY ELVIN
- REVEREND E W SAUL TRUST
- REVEREND G SWINSON TRUST
- REVEREND H J HANCOCK MEMORIAL (LEBOMBO)
- REVEREND H J HANCOCK MEMORIAL (MALAWI)
- REVEREND LEWIS WAY
- REVEREND M E THOMAS
- REVEREND WILLIAM DREW TRUST
- REVEREND WILLIAM WALLACE SCHOLARSHIP
- RIGHT REVEREND ARTHUR BERESFORD TURNER'S TRUST
- RUPERT WILKINSON
- SARAH WALLACE MEMORIAL FUND
- SCOTT BARRETT FUND
- SHANNON ENDOWMENT FUND
- SINGAPORE G D TRUST
- SOUTH BUCKS JUNIOR CLERGY MISSIONARY ASSOCIATION ENDOWMENT FUND
- SOUTH INDIA CHURCH AID FUND
- SOUTHERN MALAWI LAY TRAINING FUND
- ST AGNES CHURCH ENDOWMENT FUND (NASSAU)
- ST ANNES ENDOWMENT FUND (NASSAU)
- ST AUGUSTINE'S SCHOOL PENHALONGA
- ST EDMUNDSBURY AND IPSWICH MISSIONARY STUDENTSHIP ASSOCIATION
- ST FAITH'S SCHOOL, PEKING ENDOWMENT FUND
- ST HILDEBURGH PARISH TRUST
- ST JOHN'S CONVALESCENT FUND FOR CLERGYMEN AND OTHERS
- ST MARY'S CHURCH ENDOWMENT FUND (NASSAU)
- ST MARY'S HOUSE FUND (OTHERWISE SKISDON BED FUND)
- ST PAUL'S CHURCH TRUST
- ST PAUL'S COVENT GARDEN WARD FUND
- STAFF PENSION FUND
- STEWART BLAKENEY LEGACY
- STUTTGART CHURCH ENDOWMENT FUND
- SWINSON GIFT NO 1
- SWINSON GIFT NO 2
- T H E TRUST AND J A A J TRUST
- TALLENTS BED
- THE AFRICA FUND
- THE CAMBRIDGE MISSION TO DELHI TRUST
- THE CANDIDATES FIVE SHILLING FUND
- THE CENTRAL AFRICA FUND
- THE EAST ASIA FUND
- THE EDUCATIONAL FUND
- THE GENERAL AND DISCRETIONARY FUND
- THE GEORGE NICHOL CHARITY FOR THE UNITED SOCIETY FOR THE PROPOGATION OF THE GOSPEL
- THE HEALTH FUND
- THE LATIN AMERICA AND CARIBBEAN FUND
- THE SOUTH ASIA FUND
- THE UNITED SOCIETY FOR THE PROPAGATION OF THE GOSPEL - ASSAM: CHAPMAN LEGACY TRUST
- THEODORE FEIST
- THOMAS GILLIAN PRIZE
- TRISTAN DA CUNHA CHURCH RESTORATION FUND
- TRUST FOR MADAGASCAR COLLEGES
- TURKS ISLAND ENDOWMENT FUND (NASSAU)
- TWYNAM FUND (NASSAU)
- UNKNOWN DONORS (CHINA)
- UNKNOWN DONORS (NORTH CHINA)
- UNKNOWN DONORS (SHANTUNG FUNDS)
- UNKNOWN DONORS FOR MEDICAL WORK (1964)
- VARLEY FUND NO 1
- VARLEY FUND NO 2
- VAUDOIS CLERGY FUND
- VENEZUELA TRUST
- W E WILSON TRUST
- W H GARDNER'S GIFT
- WARNEFORD FUND
- WEDDERBURN OGILVY TRUST FUND
- WHITE KENNETT LIBRARY FUND
- WINCHESTER DIOCESAN MISSION IN MANDALAY
- WOMEN'S BURSARY FUND
- 27 November 1967 : Standard registration
- 01 May 2025 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
USPG
5 Trinity Street
LONDON
SE1 1DB
- Phone:
- 02079212200
- Email:
- info@uspg.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window