Financial history TRUST FUNDS HELD IN CONNECTION WITH ST GEORGE'S UNITED REFORMED CHURCH

Charity number: 234519
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £81.27k £34.99k £44.61k £66.66k £45.93k
Total expenditure £42.87k £40.61k £45.70k £66.92k £42.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £607 £1.04k N/A