TRUST FUNDS HELD IN CONNECTION WITH ST GEORGE'S UNITED REFORMED CHURCH

Charity number: 234519
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious activities in connection with St Georges United Reformed Church, Carlisle.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £45,932
Total expenditure: £42,677

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 November 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST GEORGE'S URC (Working name)
  • FISHER STREET PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH OF ENGLAND WITH ST GEORGE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH (Previous name)
  • FISHER STREET PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH OF ENGLAND, CARLISLE - TRUST FUNDS AND PROPERTY HELD IN CONNEXION WITH- (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Lisa Moore Wilson Trustee 30 July 2022
None on record
Pamela Mary Martin Trustee 03 July 2022
None on record
Moira Joan Wales Trustee 20 August 2019
None on record
Rosalind Fearon Trustee 20 August 2019
None on record
Marjorie Patricia Lawson Trustee 20 August 2019
None on record
Edward Anthony Wiseman Trustee 20 August 2019
None on record
John Michael Ware Trustee 01 August 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £81.27k £34.99k £44.61k £66.66k £45.93k
Total expenditure £42.87k £40.61k £45.70k £66.92k £42.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £607 £1.04k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 03 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 03 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 18 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 18 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 24 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 09 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF THE 22ND SEPTEMBER 1914.
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE BENEFIT OF SABBATH SCHOOLS. 2. FOR CARRYING ON OF MOTHERS' MEETINGS 3. TOWARDS PROVIDING AND MAINTENANCE OF LOCAL MISSIONARY.
Area of benefit
CARLISLE
Registration history
  • 26 November 1965 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
15 KENTWOOD ROAD
KENDAL
LA9 5JX
Phone:
01539722231