JACK AND BERT RICHARDS ALMSHOUSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of almshouse accommodation in Bognor Regis currently from 12 Princess Avenue Bognor Regis West Sussex PO21 2QT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 28 July 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael David Broad | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|||||
SUSAN RUTHERFORD | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Elena Vassall | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.07k | £9.89k | £13.43k | £14.70k | £15.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.05k | £11.07k | £16.04k | £10.28k | £10.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 February 2024 | 243 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 15 May 2021 | 319 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 8TH MAY 1978
Charitable objects
THE ENDOWING ERECTION AND ESTABLISHMENT OF ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR MARRIED OR SINGLE PERSONS OVER THE AGE OF SIXTY-FIVE, WHO ARE OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND OF BRITISH NATIONALITY BY BIRTH AND ARE BONA-FINE RESIDENTS OF BOGNOR REGIS OF UPWARDS OF TEN YEARS PRIOR TO THEIR OCCUPATION.
Area of benefit
BOGNOR REGIS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chamberlain Martin Solicitors
40 Sudley Road
BOGNOR REGIS
West Sussex
PO21 1ES
- Phone:
- 01243825211
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window