THE RATCLIFF CHARITY FOR THE POOR
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the relief of need, generally or individually, within the London Borough of Tower Hamlets with special reference to the Stepney area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 05 April 1967: Standard registration
- 02 May 2014: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 02 May 2014: Funds transferred to 1155094 COOPERS CHARITY CIO
- THE RATCLIFF PENSION CHARITY (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.82k | £38.18k | £37.45k | £38.88k | £46.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.82k | £46.08k | £40.16k | £44.91k | £49.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 26 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 26 November 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 14 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 14 December 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 10 February 2012 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 10 February 2012 | 10 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 01/07/1976 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 08/11/1994 AS AMENDED ON 14/01/2014
Charitable objects
1() THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY NOT MORE THAN 29/52THS OF THE CLEAR YEARLY INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN RELIEVING POOR MEMBERS OF THE COOPERS' COMPANY OR THEIR WIDOWS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS FOR RELIEF IN NEED HEREINAFTER CONTAINED. (2) THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE REMAINDER OF THE SAID INCOME IN RELIEVING IN LIKE MANNER POOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE PARISH OF STEPNEY AS CONSTITUTED ON THE 24TH JUNE 1897. (3) IF AND IN SO FAR AS INCOME IS NOT REQUIRED IN ANY YEAR FOR APPLICATION IN MANNER AFORESAID THE TRUSTEES MAY APPLY THE SAME IN RELIEVING IN LIKE MANNER POOR MEMBERS OF THE COOPERS' COMPANY OR THEIR WIDOWS OR POOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF STEPNEY AND LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window