Accounts and annual returns THE TREVOR CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 234619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 05 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 10 December 2024 309 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 01 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 10 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 10 March 2021 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required