Linked charities MILFORD UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 234709
Removed charity
Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 14/02/1928 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 18/12/1936, RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER S74(C) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 31/10/2007, AND RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER S74C & S74D OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 AS AMENDED BY THE CHARITIES ACT 2006 24/11/2009
Charitable objects
1. ·10 FOR APPRENTICING POOR RESIDENT CHILDREN IN THE PARISH TO SOME USEFUL TRADE OR OCCUPATION 2. FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR
Area of benefit
PARISH OF MILFORD-ON-SEA
Registration history
  • 04 June 1964 : Standard registration
  • 03 January 2025 : Removed