Financial history PROVIDENCE HOMES

Charity number: 234752
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £31.17k £31.22k £32.96k £33.51k £55.02k
Total expenditure £7.81k £7.94k £22.08k £16.34k £68.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A